Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Iom Health System Lp, Doing Business As Lutheran Hospital Of Indiana, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Rogers, Shontel, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 11/7/2023 : Tyler D Yeager;Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 11/7/2023 : Shontel Rogers |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerical Mistake Corrected Event entry dated 11/3//2023, Motion for Disc. of Employment Records, was entered incorrectly. The Type is incorrect. A new and correct entry added. |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disc. of Employment Records to a Non Party Filed Motion for Default Judgment |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Motion for Judgment by Default |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 08/11/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.