Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Iom Health System Lp, Doing Business As Lutheran Hospital Of Indiana, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Newgent, Bryant, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Motion for Default Judgment |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 08/11/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Notice of Exclusion |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.