Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Elizabeth Ann Hughes, Ian Bjorn Kohlhaas, Jessica Renae Kolanowski, Kliment P Mitreski, Lorena Arnold, (total of 8) See All against Davis, Gene, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 11/6/2023 : Elizabeth Ann Hughes;Ian Bjorn Kohlhaas;Jessica Renae Kolanowski;Kliment P Mitreski;Lorena Arnold;Michael L. Starzec;Matthew Michael Van Vossen;Thomas A Burris |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 11/6/2023 : Gene Davis |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Affidavit for Judgment by Default |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Notice of Claim served 8/8/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.