Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lydy Jr., Terry Lynn, filed a(n) Mi - Miscellaneous Civil case represented by Robert Henry Bellinger Ii, against Bureau Of Motor Vehicles, Mcalexander, Michael James, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryMi - Miscellaneous Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
|
Order Issued
Date: August 31, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 31, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 8/31/2023 : Bureau of Motor Vehicles;Michael James McAlexander;Robert Henry Bellinger Order Issued ---- 8/31/2023 : Bureau of Motor Vehicles;Michael James McAlexander;Robert Henry Bellinger |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order for SDP |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order waiving BMV reinstatement fees |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition for Hardship/Restricted License | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Event Costs paid |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 8/21/2023 : Bureau of Motor Vehicles;Michael James McAlexander;Robert Henry Bellinger Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 8/21/2023 : Bureau of Motor Vehicles;Michael James McAlexander;Robert Henry Bellinger |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued The Petition for Specialized Driving Privileges is set for a telephonic hearing on August 31, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Please e-file your client's proof of insurance and proof of filing SR22 at least 24 hours in advance of the hearing. At the time of hearing, please have your client contact the Court at (260) 449-7463. If you would like to participate in the hearing, you should also call the Court at the time of hearing. *Previously, it has worked well to have the client at the attorney's office to conduct the telephonic hearing, however, that will be left up to the attorney's discretion. |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Court's email of Petition to Respondent AND response. |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing on Petition for Hardship/Restricted License scheduled for 08/31/2023 at 10:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.