Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ag Rentals & Management, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon Scott Perry, against Any And All Occupants, Willis, Courtenay L, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order for Writ
Date: September 05, 2023Writ for Property Issued
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Served Possession restored 09/08/2023. |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ for Property Issued Writ of Restitution, Order for Writ, and copy of judgment for possession issued to the Sheriff. |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/24/2023 : Ramon Scott Perry;Ramon S Perry;Logan David Gilbert |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/24/2023 : Courtenay L Willis |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Partial Judgment entered | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed for Possession |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 8/02/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.