Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
University Neurosurgical Associates Pc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Scott Andrew Renner, against Bradley, Christy, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryCc - Civil Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: August 16, 2023Affidavit Filed
Date: September 22, 2023Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Date: October 18, 2023Motion for Default Judgment Filed
Date: September 22, 2023Affidavit of Non-Military Filed
Date: September 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/18/2023 : Scott Andrew Renner |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/18/2023 : Christy Bradley |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Filed AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Summons For Christy J Bradley Returned Served By Allen County Sheriff. Leaving A Copy At The Residence |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint/Equivalent Pleading |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena/Summons Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.