Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance, filed a(n) Pl - Civil Plenary case represented by Nicholas Richardson Dismukes, against Htut, Htet W, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryPl - Civil Plenary |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
|
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: July 18, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 18, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: July 18, 2023Notice of Dismissal Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: July 26, 2023Order Issued
Date: September 07, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Hearing | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 9/7/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes Order Issued ---- 9/7/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 9/7/2023 : Htet W Htut Order Issued ---- 9/7/2023 : Htet W Htut |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order of Dismissal |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed With Prejudice | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 11/01/2023 at 2:15 PM was cancelled. Reason: Other. |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Filed Farm Bureau's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 8/1/2023 : Htet W Htut Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 8/1/2023 : Htet W Htut |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 8/1/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 8/1/2023 : Nicholas Richardson Dismukes |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order for Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.