Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Dbd Homes, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon Scott Perry, against Any And All Occupants, Davis, Kryston R, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 7/18/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Issuance of Summons Notice of Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 2:30 PM. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Verification of Ownership |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.