Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Elizabeth Ann Hughes, Ian Bjorn Kohlhaas, Jessica Renae Kolanowski, Kliment P Mitreski, Lorena Arnold, (total of 8) See All against Tomei, Joe, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 8/14/2023 : Elizabeth Ann Hughes;Ian Bjorn Kohlhaas;Jessica Renae Kolanowski;Kliment P Mitreski;Lorena Arnold;Michael L. Starzec;Matthew Michael Van Vossen;Thomas A Burris |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 8/14/2023 : Joe Tomei |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed Motion for Agreed Judgment |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Notice of New Claim served 06/13/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Filed Military Affidavit |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.