Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bruce, Arthur J, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Rork, Donya Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order Issued
Date: July 07, 2023Order Issued
Date: July 07, 2023Order Issued
Date: July 14, 2023Order of Dismissal
Date: October 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Cause dismissed without prejudice as to damaged. Costs to Plaintiff. Costs paid. |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Damages Hearing | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Not Served Notice of New Claim not served. Unclaimed |
|
July 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 7/14/2023 : Arthur J Bruce;Donya Michelle Rork Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 7/14/2023 : Arthur J Bruce;Donya Michelle Rork Order Issued ---- 7/14/2023 : Arthur J Bruce;Donya Michelle Rork |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Amended Order. The Plaintiff declines to accept the Pre-Eviction Program |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Partial Judgment entered | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Damages Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 8:30 AM. |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed for Possession |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk Administrative Event Notice of New Claim neither claimed nor unclaimed by Certified Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.