Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Spencer, Sheila J Halsey, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Spencer, Clinton Ross, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryDn - Domestic Relations Without Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 12/21/2023 : Sheila J Halsey Spencer |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 12/21/2023 : Clinton Ross Spencer |
|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Temporary Restraining Order LR 719 (1) |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Filed | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena/Summons Filed | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.