Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mccague, Philip J, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Richardson-Mccague, Shannon B, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2023 |
CategoryDc - Domestic Relations With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Continuance ---- 1/16/2024 : Abbee L Vetter;Catherine Sue Christoff Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 1/16/2024 : Abbee L Vetter;Catherine Sue Christoff |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Continuance | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 2:30 PM was cancelled. Reason: Other. |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Filed Motion to Continue |
|
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Court Filed Notice of Service |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Tendering Discovery |
|
November 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Continuance ---- 11/18/2023 : Abbee L Vetter;Catherine Sue Christoff Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 11/18/2023 : Abbee L Vetter;Catherine Sue Christoff |
|
November 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Hearing originally scheduled on 11/29/2023 at 10:00 AM was rescheduled to 01/18/2024 at 2:30 PM. Reason: By Request. |
|
November 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.