Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fields, Nieisha, filed a(n) Mc - Reinstatement Waiver case against Bureau Of Motor Vehicles, Mcalexander, Michael J., in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryMc - Reinstatement Waiver |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
|
Order Granting Petition for Waiver of Reinstatement Fee
Date: August 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Petition for Waiver of Reinstatement Fee ---- 8/9/2023 : Nieisha Fields |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Petition for Waiver of Reinstatement Fee ---- 8/9/2023 : Bureau of Motor Vehicles;Michael J. McAlexander |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Petition for Waiver of Reinstatement Fee | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Issued to Parties | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Event Order waiving reinstatement fees e-mailed to the Bureau of Motor Vehicles. |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit of Indigency |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Proof of Insurance |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Volunteer Lawyer Program Eligibility Form |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Waiver of Fee for Driver License Reinstatement | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.