Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Evard Homestead, Llc, Doing Business As Evard Homestead, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Ramon Scott Perry, against Any And All Occupants, Perkins-Rush, Chakqwuona C, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served on 12/20/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 2:30 PM. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.