Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hemsoth, Richard, filed a(n) Ct - Civil Tort case represented by Christopher Ryan Blackburn, against Williams Service Center Inc, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryCt - Civil Tort |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
|
Appearance Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Order Issued
Date: December 19, 2023Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Initial Hearing | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 12/19/2023 : Christopher Ryan Blackburn Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 12/19/2023 : Christopher Ryan Blackburn |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 12/19/2023 : Williams Service Center Inc Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 12/19/2023 : Williams Service Center Inc |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order Setting Case Management Conference |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 03/25/2024 at 1:30 PM. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint for Damages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.