Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dupont Veterinary Clinic Inc, Also Known As Dupont Veterinary Clinic At Coldwater, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Brian Christopher Heck, against Schuler, Heather, Formerly Known As Patrick, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Alias Claim served 10/15/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Alias Claim |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of New Claim |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.