Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
My Bchp Owner I, Llc, Formerly Known As Brendonwood Park Apartments, Doing Business As Black Pine Flats, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon Scott Perry, against Any And All Occupants, Holman, Arianna S, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 8/02/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Issuance of Summons | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 08/24/2023 at 10:00 AM. |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.