Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Alan W Mcewan, Craig D Doyle, Jessica Sharon Owens, Matthew Lane Foutty, Nathan Alexander Dewan, (total of 8) See All against Fort Wayne Community Schools, Iom Health System L P, Mariners Ridge Homeowners Association, Phillips, Heather L, Phillips, Wade S, (total of 8) See All represented by Solomon Lowenstein Jr, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryMf - Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 31, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: August 08, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 31, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: August 23, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 31, 2023Motion to Dismiss Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: September 15, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 31, 2023Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 31, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 31, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 31, 2023Answer to a Complaint Filed
Date: September 15, 2023Answer to a Complaint Filed
Date: August 23, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: August 08, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 31, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 31, 2023Certificate of Issuance of Summons
Date: August 18, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 24, 2023Answer to a Complaint Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Notice Issued to Parties
Date: August 14, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: August 23, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 14, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Counterclaim Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 10/31/2023 : Tina M Caylor;Craig D Doyle;Matthew Lane Foutty;Scott Alan Hale;Alan W McEwan;Jessica Sharon Owens;S Brent Potter;Nathan Alexander Dewan;Madison LoDulce;Solomon Lowenstein Jr |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 10/31/2023 : Wade S Phillips;Heather L Phillips;Snow & Sauerteig LLP;IOM Health System L P;Fort Wayne Community Schools;United States Of America;State Of Indiana |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Court Costs Paid. |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed Without Prejudice | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Filed JOINT MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer to a Complaint Filed Answer |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 8/31/2023 : Tina M Caylor;Craig D Doyle;Matthew Lane Foutty;Scott Alan Hale;Alan W McEwan;Jessica Sharon Owens;S Brent Potter;Nathan Alexander Dewan;Solomon Lowenstein Jr |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 8/31/2023 : Wade S Phillips;Heather L Phillips;Snow & Sauerteig LLP;IOM Health System L P;Fort Wayne Community Schools;United States Of America;State Of Indiana |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Return of Service- Mariner's Ridge HOA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.