Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Birchum, Chris, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Chushman, Rob, Frys, Leasa, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order Granting Motion for Fee Waiver
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Emergency Eviction Hearing | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Fee Waiver ---- 7/27/2023 : Chris Birchum;Leasa Frys;Rob Chushman |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Fee Waiver | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Issued Notice of New Claim issued by Allen County Sheriff |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Self-represented |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Mtn for Emergency Possession of Real Estate/Property Filed | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Verification of Ownership |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Emergency Eviction Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 10:00 AM. |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Fee Waiver Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.