Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Christopher M Manhart, Matthew Scott Kunkle, Nicole D Manhart, Virginia Beth Albright, against Homeyer, David L, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryCc - Civil Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: July 28, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: July 28, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 28, 2023Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 18, 2023Motion to Dismiss Filed
Date: August 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 8/18/2023 : Christopher M Manhart;Virginia Beth Albright;Matthew Scott Kunkle;Nicole D Manhart |
|
August 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Dismiss ---- 8/18/2023 : David L Homeyer |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Court Costs Paid. |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed Without Prejudice | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Filed PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed eFiling Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.