Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Snow & Sauerteig Llp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Dandrea, Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories
Date: September 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogatories Filed Garnishee Defendant states Defendant is employed. |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Proceedings Supplemental |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogatories Filed Garnishee Defendant states Defendant is employed. |
|
September 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 9/22/2023 : Nicholas Dandrea;Allen County Auditor |
|
September 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 9/22/2023 : Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Proceedings Supplemental Filed Motion for Proceedings Supplemental |
|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories To Be Answered By Garnishee Defendant Interrogatories |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | First Class Mail Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.