Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael J Chapman, Nathan Ronald Duvelius, against Seferovic, Dzevahira, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
CategoryCc - Civil Collection |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeCollections |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed
Date: January 02, 2024Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Date: January 30, 2024Service Returned Served
Date: November 08, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: October 03, 2023Clerk Administrative Event
Date: July 18, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: July 14, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 1/30/2024 : Dzevahira Seferovic |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 1/30/2024 : Nathan Ronald Duvelius;Michael J Chapman |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Alias Summons Returned Served by Allen County Sheriff. Summons Served to the Residence. |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Sheriff Summons |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk Administrative Event Sheriff Mailed Copy Of Summons For Dzevahira Seferovic Returned Unserved. Return To Sender |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Summons For Dzevahira Seferovic Returned Served By Allen County Sheriff. Leaving A Copy At The Residence |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.