Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Dbd Homes, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon S Perry Iii, against Any And All Occupants, Christie, Corbin S, Sands, Olivia M, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2024 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 4/19/2024. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 05/13/2024 at 9:30 AM. |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Issuance of Summons | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction Notice of Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.