Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fresh Start Recovery, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Brian Christopher Heck, against Herendeen, Hannah, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 9/20/2023 : Hannah Herendeen |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 9/20/2023 : Brian Christopher Heck |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed Motion for Agreed Judgment |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of New Claim |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.