Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tippmann Rentals Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Sarah Louise Blake, W. Randall Kammeyer, against Derry, David, Derry, Jennifer, Occupants, All Other, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order for Writ
Date: September 01, 2023Writ for Property Issued
Date: September 01, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 11/8/2023 : Sarah Louise Blake;W. Randall Kammeyer |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 11/8/2023 : David Derry;Jennifer Derry |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Affidavit for Judgment by Default |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Not Served Document returned by the authority of the Plaintiff. |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ for Property Issued Writ of Restitution, Order for Writ, and copy of judgment for possession issued to the Sheriff. |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ | |
August 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/25/2023 : David Derry;Jennifer Derry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.