Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: the Estate of James A Long, II
An Eu - Estate, Unsupervised case was filed by Long, Mary Ann, in the jurisdiction of Allen County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 01, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 12, 2023
Filing Location
Allen County, IN
Category
EU - Estate, Unsupervised
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Estate Administration
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Order Probating Will
Date: Aug 23, 2023Order Granting Petition for Appt of Personal Representative
Date: Aug 23, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Certificate of Completion and Distribution of Inventory |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed Publisher's Affidavit |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Affidavit of Compliance with Notice of Administration to Decedent's Creditors |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Probating Will ---- 8/23/2023 : Lindsay Hurni Lepley Order Granting Petition for Appt of Personal Representative ---- 8/23/2023 : Lindsay Hurni Lepley Letter of Administration Issued (supervised or unsupervised) ---- 8/23/2023 : Lindsay Hurni Lepley Notice of Administration Issued ---- 8/23/2023 : Lindsay Hurni Lepley Notice of Administration Issued ---- 8/23/2023 : Lindsay Hurni Lepley |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Probating Will | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Petition for Appt of Personal Representative The Court appoints Mary Ann Long as Personal Representative |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Issued Notice of Administration issued to Attorney for Service by Publication |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter of Administration Issued (supervised or unsupervised) Letters issued on 8-23-2023 |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Administration Issued Notice of Administration for Publication Issued |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Administration Issued Notice of Unsupervised Administration issued to Attorney for Service to the Distributee and Creditor |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Personal Representative Filed Petition for Appointment of Personal Representative |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Probate Of Will Filed Petition for Probate of Will |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Oath Filed Personal Representative's Oath |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Filed Original Last Will and Testament |