Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aaa Acceptance Corp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Conor Slocum, against Wilson, Katia, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Not Served Notice of New Claim returned unclaimed. Not deliverable as addressed. |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Issuance of Summons Certificate of Issuance |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Contract |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.