Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by David Wayne Gray, Denise M Hallett, Keith Alan Sparks, Zachary Michael Scott Kimmel, against Owsley, Kimberlee, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | First Class Mail Returned | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 8/8/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice Of Claim |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Administrative |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Contract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.