Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aaa Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Conor Slocum, against Lepper, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings ---- 8/16/2023 : Conor Slocum |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings ---- 8/16/2023 : Amanda Lepper |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy Filed Notice of Bankruptcy |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Issuance of Summons Certification of Issuance of Summons |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.