Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Snow & Sauerteig Llp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Sanders, Melody L, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings ---- 8/21/2023 : Melody L Sanders |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings ---- 8/21/2023 : Tyler D Yeager;Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Automatic Stay of Proceedings | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy Filed Notice of Bankruptcy |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 07/24/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Notice of Exclusion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.