Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Zilla Villa Capri Apartments, Llc, Doing Business As Villa Capri Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon Scott Perry, against Any And All Occupants, James, Mandeline D, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order Denying Motion to Seal Eviction Records (IC 32-31-11)
Date: October 05, 2023Order for Writ
Date: September 08, 2023Order Issued
Date: August 10, 2023Writ for Property Issued
Date: September 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Invalid Email: Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Denying Motion to Seal Eviction Records (IC 32-31-11) -- 10/5/2023 : Mandeline D James |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Denying Motion to Seal Eviction Records (IC 32-31-11) ---- 10/5/2023 : Ramon S Perry;Mandeline D James |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion to Seal Eviction Records (IC 32-31-11) | |
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Self-represented |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Seal Eviction Records (IC 32-31-11) | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Served Possession restored on 09/13/2023 |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ for Property Issued Writ of Restitution, Order for Writ, and copy of judgment for possession issued to the Sheriff. |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/10/2023 : Ramon Scott Perry;Logan David Gilbert;Ramon S Perry Order Issued ---- 8/10/2023 : Ramon Scott Perry;Logan David Gilbert;Ramon S Perry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.