Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wildwood Apts, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Mckinney, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Writ for Property Issued
Date: August 30, 2023Order for Writ
Date: August 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/10/2023 : Nathan McKinney |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/10/2023 : Wildwood Apts |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Damages Hearing | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment Filed | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Served Possession restored on 09/01/2023 |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ for Property Issued Writ of Restitution, Order for Writ and copy of judgment for possession issued to the Sheriff. |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/15/2023 : Wildwood Apts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.