Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tabron, Thelma, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryEu - Estate, Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Order Granting Petition for Appt of Personal Representative
Date: August 07, 2023Order Probating Will
Date: August 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication Filed Proof of Publication |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Probating Will ---- 8/7/2023 : David Edward Bailey Order Granting Petition for Appt of Personal Representative ---- 8/7/2023 : David Edward Bailey Letter of Administration Issued (supervised or unsupervised) ---- 8/7/2023 : David Edward Bailey Notice of Administration Issued ---- 8/7/2023 : David Edward Bailey Notice of Administration Issued ---- 8/7/2023 : David Edward Bailey |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Petition for Appt of Personal Representative The Court appoints Arthur Byrd and Thelma Tabron as Co-Personal Representaitves |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Probating Will | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Administration Issued Notice of Administration for Publication Issued |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Issued Notice of Administration issued to Attorney for Service by Publication |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Administration Issued Notice of Unsupervised Administration issued to Attorney for Service to the Distributee and Creditor |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter of Administration Issued (supervised or unsupervised) Letters issued on 8-7-2023 |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Probate Of Will Filed Petition For Probate of Will - Arthur |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.