Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Grooms, Mark E, Hicks, Diane Renee, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryEs - Estate, Supervised |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Order Issued
Date: August 07, 2023Order Granting Petition for Appt of Personal Representative
Date: August 17, 2023Order for Hearing
Date: September 12, 2023Order Issued
Date: October 16, 2023Order Issued
Date: October 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 10/16/2023 : Andrew P Simmons;Kristin Steckbeck Bilinski;Benjamin Williams Order Issued ---- 10/16/2023 : Andrew P Simmons;Kristin Steckbeck Bilinski;Benjamin Williams |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Mediator's Acceptance |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Order appointing Mediator |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Notice And Order To Mediator And Parties |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney Conference | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 9/12/2023 : Andrew P Simmons;Kristin Steckbeck Bilinski Order for Hearing ---- 9/12/2023 : Andrew P Simmons;Kristin Steckbeck Bilinski |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Hearing | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Attorney Conference scheduled for 10/16/2023 at 10:00 AM. |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Oath Filed Personal Rep Acceptance and Oath |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Last Will and Testament Filed Codicils |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.