Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by David Wayne Gray, Denise M Hallett, Keith Alan Sparks, Zachary Michael Scott Kimmel, against Silva, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryCc - Civil Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information
Date: July 27, 2023Service Returned Served (E-Filing)
Date: August 11, 2023Motion for Default Judgment Filed
Date: September 13, 2023Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Date: October 06, 2023Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information
Date: September 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
October 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/6/2023 : Gabriel Silva |
|
October 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/6/2023 : David Wayne Gray;DENISE M HALLETT;Keith Alan Sparks;Zachary Michael Scott Kimmel |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Motion for Default Judgment |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Administrative |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Return Of Service |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons by Private Process Server |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.