Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tyler Terrance, Lp, Doing Business As Tyler Terrace Apartments, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon Scott Perry, against Partridge, Todd, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Order Granting Motion for Proceedings Supplemental
Date: November 06, 2023Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Proceedings Supplemental ---- 11/6/2023 : Ramon S Perry |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Proceedings Supplemental ---- 11/6/2023 : Todd Partridge |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Proceedings Supplemental | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Proceedings Supplemental Filed Motion for Proceedings Supplemental |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 10/31/2023 : Ramon S Perry |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 10/31/2023 : Todd Partridge |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party Order Granting Motion for Discovery of Employment Records to a Non Party. |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disc. of Employment Records to a Non Party Filed Motion for Discovery of Employment Records to a Non-Party |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 9/5/2023 : Logan David Gilbert;Ramon Scott Perry;Ramon S Perry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.