Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael J Chapman, Nathan Ronald Duvelius, against Trevino, Bryanna E, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2023 |
CategoryCc - Civil Collection |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeCollections |
Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Date: October 16, 2023Motion for Default Judgment Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: July 13, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/16/2023 : Nathan Ronald Duvelius;Michael J Chapman |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/16/2023 : Bryanna E Trevino |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Sheriff Summons Returned Served by Allen County Sheriff by leaving a copy for the within named party at the residence. |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance Form |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena/Summons Filed Summons |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed Complaint |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.