Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ridgebrook Hills Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Shanks, Jackie, Unknown Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Notice of New Claim served on 12/20/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance with Small Claims 8(C) Filed | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Verification of Ownership |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Issued | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Self-represented |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerical Mistake Corrected Service Issued event should have the comment "Notice of New Claim issued by Allen County Sheriff". |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Status Conference scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 9:00 AM. |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Eviction |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Claim Filed - Eviction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.