Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Iom Health System Lp, Doing Business As Lutheran Hospital Of Indiana, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Underwood, Allen, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories
Date: October 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogatories Filed Garnishee Defendant states Defendant is employed. |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Proceedings Supplemental |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 10/3/2023 : Allen Underwood;Omnisource, LLC |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 10/3/2023 : Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories To Be Answered By Garnishee Defendant Interrogatories |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Proceedings Supplemental Filed Verified Motion for Proceedings Supplemental |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 9/18/2023 : Allen Underwood |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 9/18/2023 : Tyler D Yeager;Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Motion for Judgment by Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.