Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Franklin Law, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Emily Szczepkowski, Lindsay M Franklin, against Collins, Neil, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: November 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Continuance ---- 11/7/2023 : Emily Szczepkowski |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Continuance | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Bench Trial scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 10:30 AM. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Filed Motion to Continue |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Bench Trial scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 9:00 AM. |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of New Claim |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.