Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fort Wayne Housing Authority, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Christopher C Bandemer, against Hicks, Jeffrey, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order for Writ
Date: October 05, 2023Writ for Property Issued
Date: October 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Served Possesssion restored 10/11/2023 |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ for Property Issued Writ of Restitution, Order for Writ, and copy of judgment for possession issued to the Sheriff. |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 9/27/2023 : Jeffrey Hicks |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 9/27/2023 : Christopher C Bandemer |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed For Possession |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Partial Judgment entered | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Eviction Claim served 9/02/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.