Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by David Wayne Gray, Denise M Hallett, Keith Alan Sparks, Zachary Michael Scott Kimmel, against Shipley, Julia A, Also Known As Marsh, Julia, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 10/3/2023 : David Wayne Gray;DENISE M HALLETT;Keith Alan Sparks;Zachary Michael Scott Kimmel |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 10/3/2023 : Julia A Shipley |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed Motion for Judgment |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Filed Affidavit of Non-Military Service |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 07/30/2023. Personal |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Administrative |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice Of Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.