Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Fort Wayne Violations Bureau, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Lewis, Daniel I, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 9/25/2023 : Tyler D Yeager;Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 9/25/2023 : Daniel I Lewis |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed Agreed Judgment |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Notice of New Claim served 08/17/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.