Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Heritage Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Charles Chester Gaver Iii, against Woods, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2023 |
CategoryCc - Civil Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeCollections |
Complaint/Equivalent Pleading Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Appearance Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Subpoena/Summons Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party
Date: November 07, 2023Motion for Disc. of Employment Records to a Non Party Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment
Date: October 06, 2023Motion for Default Judgment Filed
Date: September 14, 2023Service Returned Served
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 11/7/2023 : Christopher Woods |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 11/7/2023 : Charles Chester Gaver |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party Order Granting Motion for Discovery of Employment Records to a Non Party. |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Disc. of Employment Records to a Non Party Filed Motion for Discovery of Employment Records - Workforce Development |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
October 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/6/2023 : Christopher Woods |
|
October 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment ---- 10/6/2023 : Charles Chester Gaver |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Motion with Affidavit |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Summons Returned Served by Allen County Sheriff by reading/delivering a copy to the within named party. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.