Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fort Wayne Neurosurgery, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Brian Christopher Heck, against Kissinger, Megan R, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Proceedings Supplemental |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 10/30/2023 : Brian Christopher Heck |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 10/30/2023 : Megan R Kissinger;VAV Operations, LLC |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories To Be Answered By Garnishee Defendant Interrogatories |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Proceedings Supplemental Filed Motion for Proceedings Supplemental |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/3/2023 : Brian Christopher Heck |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Default Judgment entered ---- 10/3/2023 : Megan R Kissinger |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment entered | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed Motion for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.