Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Snow & Sauerteig Llp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Townsend, Michael A, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 7/13/2023 : Tyler D Yeager;Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 7/13/2023 : Michael A Townsend |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed Motion for Agreed Judgment |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 06/20/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Contract |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Notice of Exclusion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.