Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Snow & Sauerteig Llp, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Paul Otto Sauerteig, Tyler D Yeager, against Jones, Alysia M, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2023 |
CategorySc - Small Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 7/18/2023 : Alysia M Jones |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Judgment entered ---- 7/18/2023 : Tyler D Yeager;Paul Otto Sauerteig |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Filed Motion for Agreed Judgment |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
ODR Eligible Please visit: courts.in.gov/odr |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of New Claim served 06/19/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cause Of Actions Complaint on Account |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Claim Filed Notice of Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.