Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Anthony Wayne Credit Adjusters, Sms Property Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by David Gregory Crell, Sarah Louise Blake, W. Randall Kammeyer, against Scott, Andrew, Scott, Chaunell, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories
Date: January 31, 2024Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party
Date: January 02, 2024Writ for Property Issued
Date: July 25, 2023Order Issued
Date: June 27, 2023Order Granting
Date: October 05, 2023Order for Writ
Date: July 25, 2023Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories
Date: October 24, 2023Order Issued
Date: June 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Filed CCS Entry |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service - separately filed Proceedings Supplemental |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer to Interrogatories Filed Garnishee Defendant states Defendant is not employed. |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 1/31/2024 : W. Randall Kammeyer |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories ---- 1/31/2024 : Chaunell Scott;Reliable Cleaning Service |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Answer Interrogatories | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Proceedings Supplemental Filed Verified Motion for Proceeding Supplemental to Defendant and Garnishee Defendant |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 1/2/2024 : Andrew Scott Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 1/2/2024 : Chaunell Scott |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 1/2/2024 : W. Randall Kammeyer Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party ---- 1/2/2024 : W. Randall Kammeyer |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion for Disc. of Emp. Records to Non Party |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.