Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tipsord, Alison Raye, filed a(n) Mi - Miscellaneous Civil case represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryMi - Miscellaneous Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
|
Order for Hearing
Date: August 02, 2023Order Issued
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Issued Order for Change of Name, copy of Birth Certificate, and Petition emailed to Bureau of Identification and forwarded to Allen County Board of Health and mailed to Indiana State Department of Health. |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment entered | |
October 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Issued ---- 10/20/2023 : Alison Raye Tipsord |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Petitioner's Petition for Change of Name is GRANTED. Petitioner's name is hereby changed to Alison Raye Godfrey. Costs paid. |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Name Hearing | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication Filed | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order for Hearing ---- 8/2/2023 : Alison Raye Tipsord Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 8/2/2023 : Alison Raye Tipsord |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Hearing | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Change of Name Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 11:00 AM. |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.