Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Conwell, Robin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Conwell, Carey, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2023 |
CategoryDc - Domestic Relations With Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Establish Paternity | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Order Granting Motion to Intervene ---- 8/3/2023 : Andrew James Schweller;Evan Gregory Thorstad;Bradley James Bowers;Gale Lyn Palmer Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 8/3/2023 : Andrew James Schweller;Bre'Anna S. Donaldson;Evan Gregory Thorstad;Bradley James Bowers;Gale Lyn Palmer;Michael James McAlexander Order Issued ---- 8/3/2023 : Andrew James Schweller;Evan Gregory Thorstad;Bradley James Bowers;Gale Lyn Palmer |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 8/3/2023 : Robin Conwell;Carey Conwell Order Granting Motion to Intervene ---- 8/3/2023 : The State of Indiana Order Issued ---- 8/3/2023 : The State of Indiana |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Issued Notice of Heaing/Order to Appear |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing on Petition to Establish Paternity scheduled for 09/26/2023 at 9:00 AM. |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion to Intervene | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition to Establish Child Support Filed Petition to Establish Child Support |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service of Process Waived Waiver of Service |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.